This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 07/29/2019 at 22:03:07 (UTC).

WILKINSON, ROXANA VS CREWS, VICKIE

Case Summary

On 07/05/2019 WILKINSON, ROXANA filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against CREWS, VICKIE. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLEMAN, TOM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLEMAN, TOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILKINSON, ROXANA

Defendant

CREWS, VICKIE

 

Court Documents

EVICTION COMPLAINT

07/05/2019:EVICTION COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO VICKIE CREWS

07/08/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO VICKIE CREWS

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION AND RESERVATION OF JURISDICTION

07/19/2019:DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION AND RESERVATION OF JURISDICTION

RETURN OF SERVICE-FOR VICKIE CREWS ON 07/09/2019 POSTED

07/10/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE-FOR VICKIE CREWS ON 07/09/2019 POSTED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST VICKIE CREWS

07/17/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST VICKIE CREWS

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT IN EVICTION

07/17/2019:MOTION FOR JUDGMENT IN EVICTION

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

07/23/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION AND RESERVATION OF JURISDICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • EMAILED DFJ TO JUDGES OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR JUDGMENT IN EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST VICKIE CREWS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE-FOR VICKIE CREWS ON 07/09/2019 POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO VICKIE CREWS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Judge: COLEMAN , TOM Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Payment received: $195.00 Receipt Number CC 153532

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • INITIAL NOTICE (3day)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • COVER LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • Case 122019CC000902CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/5/2019

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.