Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 04/16/2021 at 15:04:20 (UTC).

WILKINSON, MICHAEL A VS WILKINSON, SARAH

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 WILKINSON, MICHAEL A filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WILKINSON, SARAH. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are OLIN, MELISSA GATES, OLIN, MELISSA G and MELISSA OLIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

OLIN, MELISSA GATES

OLIN, MELISSA G

MELISSA OLIN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WILKINSON, MICHAEL A

Respondent

WILKINSON, SARAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BUTLER, RACHEL CAROLINE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketEvent FH scheduled on 4/30/2021 at 1100 AM, JC - Judge MELISSA OLIN presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE FOR TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketANSWER, WAIVER AND REQUEST FOR COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE- SARAH WILKINSON SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO SARAH WILKINSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number CC 185190

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketJudge: OLIN , MELISSA G Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number CC 185053

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCase 122021DR000161DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUTLER, RACHEL CAROLINE