Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 11/09/2020 at 15:05:49 (UTC).

WADE, JULIE VS WADE, JEFFREY

Case Summary

On 10/16/2020 WADE, JULIE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WADE, JEFFREY. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MELISSA OLIN, OLIN, MELISSA GATES and OLIN, MELISSA G. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MELISSA OLIN

OLIN, MELISSA GATES

OLIN, MELISSA G

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WADE, JULIE

Respondent

WADE, JEFFREY

Not Classified By Court

JOHNSON, JULIE REBECCA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BUTLER, RACHEL CAROLINE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 10/26/2020 at 0345 PM, JC - Judge MELISSA OLIN presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketJudge: OLIN , MELISSA G Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketNOTICE FOR TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketHUSBAND'S ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE, WAIVER OF PERSONAL SERVICE AND ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number CC 177062

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCase 122020DR000537DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUTLER, RACHEL CAROLINE