Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 04/16/2021 at 19:02:57 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR LLC VS NAYLOR, SARAH

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 UNIFUND CCR LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NAYLOR, SARAH. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SARA CARTER, CARTER, SARA JANE and CARTER, SARA J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SARA CARTER

CARTER, SARA JANE

CARTER, SARA J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIFUND CCR LLC

Defendant

NAYLOR, SARAH

Lake City, FL 32025

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAHN, JEFFREY LEE

 

Court Documents

PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO SARAH NAYLOR

04/09/2021:PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO SARAH NAYLOR

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/09/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 05/19/2021 14:30; Judge: CARTER, SARA J; Docket Type: SMCL Pretrial; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEvent SMCL Pretrial scheduled on 5/19/2021 at 0230 PM, M1 - Judge SARA CARTER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketJudge: CARTER , SARA J Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO SARAH NAYLOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number CC 185871

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCase 122021SC000368SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/9/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIFUND CCR LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAHN, JEFFREY LEE