This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 07/21/2019 at 22:03:13 (UTC).

SPT WAH WINDSONG II LLC VS IRVING, JAMIE Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 SPT WAH WINDSONG II LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against IRVING, JAMIE. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLEMAN, TOM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLEMAN, TOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPT WAH WINDSONG II LLC

Defendants

TUMBLIN, TRISTON

IRVING, JAMIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARRON, JAMES IVY

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE-FOR JAMIE IRVING ON 07/10/2019 IND

07/10/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE-FOR JAMIE IRVING ON 07/10/2019 IND

RETURN OF SERVICE-FOR TRISTON TUMBLIN ON 07/10/2019

07/10/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE-FOR TRISTON TUMBLIN ON 07/10/2019

UPS MAIL RECEIPT

07/06/2019:UPS MAIL RECEIPT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO TRISTON TUMBLIN

06/27/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO TRISTON TUMBLIN

SUMMONS ISSUED TO JAMIE IRVING

06/27/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO JAMIE IRVING

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/27/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • EMAILED ANSWER AND REQUEST FOR HEARING TO JUGDES OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • ANSWER FROM JAMIE IRVING AND TRISTON TUMBLIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE-FOR JAMIE IRVING ON 07/10/2019 IND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE-FOR TRISTON TUMBLIN ON 07/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • UPS MAIL RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Judge: COLEMAN , TOM Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO TRISTON TUMBLIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO JAMIE IRVING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Payment received: $209.00 Receipt Number CC 153111

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $209.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $209.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Case 122019CC000881CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less