This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 07/15/2020 at 12:06:11 (UTC).

SOLER, JIMMY EDWARD VS SOLER, BEVERLY L

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 SOLER, JIMMY EDWARD filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SOLER, BEVERLY L. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are OLIN, MELISSA G, MELISSA OLIN and OLIN, MELISSA GATES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

OLIN, MELISSA G

MELISSA OLIN

OLIN, MELISSA GATES

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SOLER, JIMMY EDWARD

Respondent

SOLER, BEVERLY L

Not Classified By Court

HILLER, BEVERLY L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketEvent FH scheduled on 2/10/2020 at 0130 PM, MX - Judge MELISSA OLIN presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJudge: OLIN , MELISSA G Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketRECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number CC 162166

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase 122019DR000782DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/6/2019

    Read MoreRead Less