This case was last updated from Columbia County - Third Judicial Circuit Court on 07/14/2020 at 17:56:23 (UTC).

SANDERS, WILLIAM EDWARD JR VS JENNIFER STRICKLAND LLC

Case Summary

On 04/28/2020 SANDERS, WILLIAM EDWARD JR filed an Other lawsuit against JENNIFER STRICKLAND LLC. This case was filed in Columbia County - Third Judicial Circuit Court , Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DOUGLAS, WESLEY RAYMOND and DOUGLAS, WESLEY R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DOUGLAS, WESLEY RAYMOND

DOUGLAS, WESLEY R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANDERS, WILLIAM EDWARD JR

Defendant

JENNIFER STRICKLAND LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MASON, ROGER DANIEL

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/29/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

04/29/2020:COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, JENNIFER STRICKLAND LLC, DBA RIGHT WAY AUTOMOTIVE

04/29/2020:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, JENNIFER STRICKLAND LLC, DBA RIGHT WAY AUTOMOTIVE

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, JENNIFER STRICKLAND LLC, DBA RIGHT WAY AUTOMOTIVE

04/29/2020:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, JENNIFER STRICKLAND LLC, DBA RIGHT WAY AUTOMOTIVE

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

04/29/2020:NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

04/29/2020:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO JENNIFER STRICKLAND, LLC D/B/A RIGHT WAY AUTOMOTIVE REGISTERED AGENT, JENNIFER R. WILLIAMSON

04/29/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO JENNIFER STRICKLAND, LLC D/B/A RIGHT WAY AUTOMOTIVE REGISTERED AGENT, JENNIFER R. WILLIAMSON

RETURN OF SERVICE- JENNIFER STRICKLAND, LLC D/B/A RIGHT WAY AUTOMOTIVE, R.A. JENNIFER R. WILLIAMS SERVED 05-19-20 (CORP-KRISTY, FINANCE MANAGER)

05/27/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE- JENNIFER STRICKLAND, LLC D/B/A RIGHT WAY AUTOMOTIVE, R.A. JENNIFER R. WILLIAMS SERVED 05-19-20 (CORP-KRISTY, FINANCE MANAGER)

RETURN OF SERVICE- JENNIFER STRICKLAND, LLC DBA RIGHT WAY AUTOMOTIVE SERVED 05-19-20 (CORP-KRISTY, FINANCE MANAGER)

05/27/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE- JENNIFER STRICKLAND, LLC DBA RIGHT WAY AUTOMOTIVE SERVED 05-19-20 (CORP-KRISTY, FINANCE MANAGER)

MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT AND CLERK'S DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST JENNIFER STRICKLAND LLC D/B/A RIGHT WAY AUTOMOTIVE

06/09/2020:MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT AND CLERK'S DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST JENNIFER STRICKLAND LLC D/B/A RIGHT WAY AUTOMOTIVE

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

06/09/2020:DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/09/2020:DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/09/2020:DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

06/10/2020:DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

MOTION TO VACATE CLERK'S DEFAULT ENTERED ON JUNE 9, 2020 AGAINST DEFENDANT, JENNIFER STRICKLAND, LLC D/B/A RIGHT WAY AUTOMOTIVE

06/15/2020:MOTION TO VACATE CLERK'S DEFAULT ENTERED ON JUNE 9, 2020 AGAINST DEFENDANT, JENNIFER STRICKLAND, LLC D/B/A RIGHT WAY AUTOMOTIVE

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO VACATE CLERK'S DEFAULT ENTERED ON JUNE 9, 2020 AGAINST DEFENDANT, JENNIFER STRICKLAND, LLC D/B/A RIGHT WAY AUTOMOTIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT AND CLERK'S DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST JENNIFER STRICKLAND LLC D/B/A RIGHT WAY AUTOMOTIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE- JENNIFER STRICKLAND, LLC DBA RIGHT WAY AUTOMOTIVE SERVED 05-19-20 (CORP-KRISTY, FINANCE MANAGER)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE- JENNIFER STRICKLAND, LLC D/B/A RIGHT WAY AUTOMOTIVE, R.A. JENNIFER R. WILLIAMS SERVED 05-19-20 (CORP-KRISTY, FINANCE MANAGER)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketJudge: DOUGLAS , WESLEY R Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number CC 169682

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO JENNIFER STRICKLAND, LLC D/B/A RIGHT WAY AUTOMOTIVE REGISTERED AGENT, JENNIFER R. WILLIAMSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, JENNIFER STRICKLAND LLC, DBA RIGHT WAY AUTOMOTIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, JENNIFER STRICKLAND LLC, DBA RIGHT WAY AUTOMOTIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketCase 122020CA000116CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/28/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MASON, ROGER D II