This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 10/15/2020 at 18:10:40 (UTC).

ROBINSON, DOROTHY VS NAKASH, YOSSI

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 ROBINSON, DOROTHY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NAKASH, YOSSI. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are TOM COLEMAN and COLEMAN, TOM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

TOM COLEMAN

COLEMAN, TOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBINSON, DOROTHY

Defendant

NAKASH, YOSSI

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE- FOR YOSSI NAKSH SERVED ON 09/22/2020 SUB (MICHEAL NAKASH/BUSINESS PARTNER)

09/23/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE- FOR YOSSI NAKSH SERVED ON 09/22/2020 SUB (MICHEAL NAKASH/BUSINESS PARTNER)

RECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

09/22/2020:RECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF CLAIM- LETTER OF EXPLENATION TO PRO-SE PLAINTIFF

09/22/2020:RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF CLAIM- LETTER OF EXPLENATION TO PRO-SE PLAINTIFF

PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO YOSSI NAKASH

09/22/2020:PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO YOSSI NAKASH

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/04/2020 09:00; Judge: COLEMAN, TOM; Docket Type: SMCL Pretrial; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE- FOR YOSSI NAKSH SERVED ON 09/22/2020 SUB (MICHEAL NAKASH/BUSINESS PARTNER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number CC 175757

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $175.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF CLAIM- LETTER OF EXPLENATION TO PRO-SE PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO YOSSI NAKASH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketActive Process SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketEvent SMCL Pretrial scheduled on 11/4/2020 at 0900 AM, M1 - Judge TOM COLEMAN presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM ( WITH ATTACHED DOCUMENTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase 122020SC000905SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketJudge: COLEMAN , TOM assigned

    Read MoreRead Less