This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 07/29/2019 at 15:01:38 (UTC).

ROBINSON, CHELSEA EILLEEN VS CARFAGNO, RENZO NAHUEL

Case Summary

On 07/05/2019 ROBINSON, CHELSEA EILLEEN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CARFAGNO, RENZO NAHUEL. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is OLIN, MELISSA G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

OLIN, MELISSA G

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROBINSON, CHELSEA EILLEEN

Respondent

CARFAGNO, RENZO NAHUEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CALVIN, EMILY RAE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE-RENZO NAHUEL CARFAGNO SERVED 7/15/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • MOTION FOR TEMPORARY SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Judge: OLIN , MELISSA G Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO RENZO CARFAGNO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY AND JURISDICTION ACT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • BASIC PARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILD(REN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • NOTICE OF FILING STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • Case 122019DR000441DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/5/2019

    Read MoreRead Less