This case was last updated from Columbia County - Third Judicial Circuit Court on 07/14/2020 at 15:34:15 (UTC).

RIVERO, SURAMA VS WINN DIXIE STORES INC A FLORID

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 RIVERO, SURAMA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WINN DIXIE STORES INC A FLORID. This case was filed in Columbia County - Third Judicial Circuit Court , Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DOUGLAS, WESLEY RAYMOND and DOUGLAS, WESLEY R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DOUGLAS, WESLEY RAYMOND

DOUGLAS, WESLEY R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIVERO, SURAMA

Defendant

WINN DIXIE STORES INC A FLORID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCLOSKEY, SHAWN GREGORY

Defendant Attorney

RAMSEY, RICHARD EDWARD

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/18/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

02/18/2020:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

02/18/2020:NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC., A FLORIDA PROFIT CORPORATION

02/18/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC., A FLORIDA PROFIT CORPORATION

NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC., A FLRODIA PROFIT CORPORATION

02/18/2020:NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC., A FLRODIA PROFIT CORPORATION

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC., A FLORIDA PROFIT CORPORATION

02/18/2020:PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC., A FLORIDA PROFIT CORPORATION

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

03/06/2020:DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/06/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, SURAMA RIVERO

03/06/2020:DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, SURAMA RIVERO

DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF

03/06/2020:DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, MOTION TO STRIKE AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW AND SUPPORT

03/06/2020:DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, MOTION TO STRIKE AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW AND SUPPORT

RETURN OF SERVICE- WINN DIXIE STORES, INC., A FLORIDA PROFIT CORPORATION, BY AND THROUGH ITS REGISTERED AGENT: CORP SERVICE COMPANY SERVED 02-26-20 (CORP-RA)

03/06/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE- WINN DIXIE STORES, INC., A FLORIDA PROFIT CORPORATION, BY AND THROUGH ITS REGISTERED AGENT: CORP SERVICE COMPANY SERVED 02-26-20 (CORP-RA)

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

04/06/2020:DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING MENTAL ANGUISH CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL BETTER RESPONSES TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE NUMBER 6 AND NUMBER 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL BETTER ANSWERS TO INTEROGATORRY NUMBERS 16, 17, 20, 21, 22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING AUTHORITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL IN-STORE VIDEO IN RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE NUMNER 12 AD OVERRULE OBJECTIONS TO INTERROGATORY NUMBERS 20, 21 AND 22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT, WINN DIXIE STORES, INC'S, MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT, WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC.'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC., A FLORIDA PROFIT CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC., A FLRODIA PROFIT CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC., A FLORIDA PROFIT CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number CC 166080

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCase 122020CA000043CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/18/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Winn Dixie Stores Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ramsey, Richard Edward