This case was last updated from Third Circuit Courts - Columbia County on 09/08/2021 at 05:45:27 (UTC).

RHODEN, KATHERINE MARIE VS GUYTON, RENADA NICHOLE NELSON

Case Summary

On 05/18/2021 RHODEN, KATHERINE MARIE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GUYTON, RENADA NICHOLE NELSON. This case was filed in Third Circuit Courts - Columbia County, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN, BRYAN, PAUL S, FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD, FEAGLE, MARK E and DOUGLAS, WESLEY R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN

BRYAN, PAUL S

FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD

FEAGLE, MARK E

DOUGLAS, WESLEY R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RHODEN, KATHERINE MARIE

Defendants

GUYTON, RENADA NICHOLE NELSON

FLORIDA FARM BUREAU GENERAL IN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAGEN, STEVEN A

Defendant Attorneys

GLASS, MICHAEL LEE

BIEWEND, JENNIFER CATHERINE

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT, FLORIDA FARM BUREAU GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S, NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

07/02/2021:DEFENDANT, FLORIDA FARM BUREAU GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S, NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANT, RENADA GUYTON'S NOTICE OF SERVING INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, KATHERINE RHODEN

06/24/2021:DEFENDANT, RENADA GUYTON'S NOTICE OF SERVING INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, KATHERINE RHODEN

RETURN OF SERVICE- FLORIDA FARM BUREAU GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY C/O STEPHEN GRABOW, RA SERVED BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY ON 06-04-21

06/14/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE- FLORIDA FARM BUREAU GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY C/O STEPHEN GRABOW, RA SERVED BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY ON 06-04-21

RETURN OF SERVICE-RENADA NICHOLE NELSON GUYTON SERVED 06-02-21 (INDV)

06/07/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE-RENADA NICHOLE NELSON GUYTON SERVED 06-02-21 (INDV)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNINSURED/UNDERINSURED MOTORIST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

05/28/2021:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNINSURED/UNDERINSURED MOTORIST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH THE THIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

05/24/2021:ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH THE THIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL

05/18/2021:NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

05/18/2021:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO FLORIDA FARM BUREAU GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY C/O DEPARTMENT OF INSURANCE RESIDENT AGENT FOR DEFENDANT PROCESS SECTION

05/18/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO FLORIDA FARM BUREAU GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY C/O DEPARTMENT OF INSURANCE RESIDENT AGENT FOR DEFENDANT PROCESS SECTION

SUMMONS ISSUED TO RENADA NICHOLE NELSON GUYTON

05/18/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO RENADA NICHOLE NELSON GUYTON

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/18/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF COMPLETION AND RETURN OF DEFENDANT(S) INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF COMPLETION AND RETURN OF DEFENDANT(S) INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT FLORIDA FARM BUREAU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT, RENADA GUYTON'S, RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT, RENADA GUYTON'S, RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT, RENADA GUYTON'S, NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S AMENDED RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT. RENADA NICHOLE NELSON GUYTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO FLORIDA FARM BUREAU GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY C/O DEPARTMENT OF INSURANCE RESIDENT AGENT FOR DEFENDANT PROCESS SECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO RENADA NICHOLE NELSON GUYTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketMOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCase 122021CA000125CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bagen, Steven A