This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 10/15/2020 at 18:11:43 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS HOLLINGSWORTH, RENEE

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HOLLINGSWORTH, RENEE. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are TOM COLEMAN and COLEMAN, TOM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

TOM COLEMAN

COLEMAN, TOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

HOLLINGSWORTH, RENEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FAGEN, JESSICA JO

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE- FOR RENEE HOLLINGSWORTH SERVED 10/03/2020 IND.

10/06/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE- FOR RENEE HOLLINGSWORTH SERVED 10/03/2020 IND.

PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO RENEE HOLLINGSWORTH

09/21/2020:PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO RENEE HOLLINGSWORTH

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/21/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/04/2020 09:00; Judge: COLEMAN, TOM; Docket Type: SMCL Pretrial; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE- FOR RENEE HOLLINGSWORTH SERVED 10/03/2020 IND.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketEvent SMCL Pretrial scheduled on 11/4/2020 at 0900 AM, M1 - Judge TOM COLEMAN presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketJudge: COLEMAN , TOM Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number CC 175727

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO RENEE HOLLINGSWORTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase 122020SC000901SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less