This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 09/09/2021 at 06:58:40 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS GILLYARD, JOSEPH M

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GILLYARD, JOSEPH M. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CARTER, SARA JANE, CARTER, SARA J and SARA CARTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CARTER, SARA JANE

CARTER, SARA J

SARA CARTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

GILLYARD, JOSEPH M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGER, SHAYNA L.

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE- JOSEPH M GILLYARD C/O JOSEPH M GILLYARD SERVED 07/14/21 (INDV)

07/14/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE- JOSEPH M GILLYARD C/O JOSEPH M GILLYARD SERVED 07/14/21 (INDV)

PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED JOSEPH M GILLYARD

07/07/2021:PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED JOSEPH M GILLYARD

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/07/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 10/20/2021 09:00; Judge: CARTER, SARA J; Docket Type: SMCL Pretrial; Location: JUDGE'S CHAMBERS VIA ZO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE- JOSEPH M GILLYARD C/O JOSEPH M GILLYARD SERVED 07/14/21 (INDV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketEvent SMCL Pretrial scheduled on 10/20/2021 at 0900 AM, JC - Judge SARA CARTER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketJudge: CARTER , SARA J Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number CC 190973

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED JOSEPH M GILLYARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCase 122021SC000739SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/7/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAYNA L SINGER, ESQ