This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 10/31/2021 at 15:02:43 (UTC).

POPE, LOGAN MICHELLE VS POPE, RYAN LEE

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 POPE, LOGAN MICHELLE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against POPE, RYAN LEE. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are OLIN, MELISSA GATES and OLIN, MELISSA G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

OLIN, MELISSA GATES

OLIN, MELISSA G

 

Party Details

Petitioner

POPE, LOGAN MICHELLE

Respondent

POPE, RYAN LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WALKER, FOYE BUCHANNON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketORDER ON EMERGENCY VERIFIED MOTION FOR CHILD PICK UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketEMERGENCY VERIFIED MOTION FOR CHILD PICK UP ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketJudge: OLIN , MELISSA G Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $418.00 Receipt Number CC 195802

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $418.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO RYAN POPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCase 122021DR000496DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/7/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Walker, Foye Buchannon