This case was last updated from Third Circuit Courts - Columbia County on 09/08/2021 at 05:46:31 (UTC).

PLUTARCO LLC VS PELLETIER, JAVIER Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/11/2021 PLUTARCO LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PELLETIER, JAVIER. This case was filed in Third Circuit Courts - Columbia County, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD and FEAGLE, MARK E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD

FEAGLE, MARK E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PLUTARCO LLC

Defendants

PELLETIER, JAVIER

PELLETIER, MARTHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FOREMAN, JOEL FLETCHER

 

Court Documents

AMENDED NOTICE OF SERVICE AND FILING OF THIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES (Amended to Correct Service Date)

05/20/2021:AMENDED NOTICE OF SERVICE AND FILING OF THIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES (Amended to Correct Service Date)

RECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

05/17/2021:RECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

05/11/2021:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO MARTHA PELLETIER

05/11/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO MARTHA PELLETIER

SUMMONS ISSUED TO JAVIER PELLETIER

05/11/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO JAVIER PELLETIER

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/11/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF JAVIER AND MARTHA PELLETIER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE FROM JAVIER PELETIER TO EMAIL FROM JOEL FOREMAN, ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER WITH ATTACHED PLAN AND PROCEDURES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (WITH SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS FROM OTHER COLUMBIA COUNTY CASES.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF SERVICE AND FILING OF THIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES (Amended to Correct Service Date)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE AND FILING OF THIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING RETURNS OF SERVICE FOR JAVIER PELLETIER SERVED 05/17/21 (SUB. MARTHA PELLETIER-WIFE) MARTHA PELLETIER SERVED 05/17/21 (INDV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number CC 188025

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketJudge: FEAGLE , MARK E Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO MARTHA PELLETIER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO JAVIER PELLETIER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $425.00 Receipt Number CC 187675

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $425.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $425.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCase 122021CA000117CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FOREMAN, JOEL FLETCHER