Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 04/25/2021 at 14:35:44 (UTC).

PELT, JOE HENTON, PELT, PEGGY ANN Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 PELT, JOE HENTON, PELT, PEGGY ANN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are OLIN, MELISSA GATES and OLIN, MELISSA G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

OLIN, MELISSA GATES

OLIN, MELISSA G

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PELT, JOE HENTON

Decedent

PELT, PEGGY ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ALVAREZ, DEREK BRIAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCOVER LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketJudge: OLIN , MELISSA G Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number CC 186132

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketPERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE'S AFFIDAVIT OF ESTATE BENEFICIARIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketPETITION TO WAIVE BOND OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCase 122021CP000119CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALVAREZ , DEREK B