This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 11/28/2019 at 15:00:35 (UTC).

PECORARO CAMPOS, KATHLEEN M VS CAMPOS, MARCO A

Case Summary

On 11/04/2019 PECORARO CAMPOS, KATHLEEN M filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CAMPOS, MARCO A. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FEAGLE, MARK E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FEAGLE, MARK E

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PECORARO CAMPOS, KATHLEEN M

Respondent

CAMPOS, MARCO A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DECKER, ANDREW JOSEPH

Respondent Attorney

LOPER, BRITTANY MARIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE-MARCO CAMPOS SERVED 11/19/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number CC 160721

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO MARCO CAMPOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketJudge: FEAGLE , MARK E Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number CC 160403

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR TEMPORARY SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXCLISIVE USE OF MARITAL HOME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketCase 122019DR000720DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/4/2019

    Read MoreRead Less