This case was last updated from Third Circuit Courts - Columbia County on 09/08/2021 at 05:45:47 (UTC).

PEASLEE, R READ VS FUTCH, MARY JO

Case Summary

On 05/14/2021 PEASLEE, R READ filed a Probate - Trust lawsuit against FUTCH, MARY JO. This case was filed in Third Circuit Courts - Columbia County, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN, BRYAN, PAUL S, FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD and FEAGLE, MARK E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN

BRYAN, PAUL S

FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD

FEAGLE, MARK E

 

Party Details

Defendants and Plaintiffs

FUTCH, MARY JO

PEASLEE, R READ

WILKINS, ROBERT C JR

FUTCH, CARSON

FUTCH, WAYNE

FUTCH, MORRIS

FUTCH, JANET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILKINS, ROBERT CHARLES

Defendant Attorneys

HEARN, STEVEN LEE

MILLER, MARK NELSON

 

Court Documents

R. READ PEASLEE'S ANSWER TO PETITION FOR REMOVAL OF TRUSTEE

07/15/2021:R. READ PEASLEE'S ANSWER TO PETITION FOR REMOVAL OF TRUSTEE

RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR REMOVAL OF R. READ PEASLEE AS TRUSTEE

07/07/2021:RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR REMOVAL OF R. READ PEASLEE AS TRUSTEE

DEFENDANT CARSON FUTCH' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR REMOVAL OF TRUSTEE

07/06/2021:DEFENDANT CARSON FUTCH' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR REMOVAL OF TRUSTEE

MOTION TO ADVANCE TRIAL ON THE DOCKET

06/30/2021:MOTION TO ADVANCE TRIAL ON THE DOCKET

OBJECTION TO TRUSTEE'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO PAY ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS FROM TRUSTS AND MOTION FOR ORDER PROHIBITING USE OF TRUSTS' ASSETS

06/29/2021:OBJECTION TO TRUSTEE'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO PAY ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS FROM TRUSTS AND MOTION FOR ORDER PROHIBITING USE OF TRUSTS' ASSETS

NOTICE OF INTENT TO PAY ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS FROM TRUSTS

06/25/2021:NOTICE OF INTENT TO PAY ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS FROM TRUSTS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY E-MAIL ADDRESSES

06/25/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY E-MAIL ADDRESSES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF THIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

06/17/2021:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF THIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

MEMORANDUM OF REASSIGNMENT

06/16/2021:MEMORANDUM OF REASSIGNMENT

ORDER OF RECUSAL

06/16/2021:ORDER OF RECUSAL

MOTION FOR RESCUSAL

06/11/2021:MOTION FOR RESCUSAL

SUMMONS ISSUED TO TOM J. HANEY

06/08/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO TOM J. HANEY

SUMMONS ISSUED TO R. READ PEASLEE

06/08/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO R. READ PEASLEE

ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH THE THIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

06/02/2021:ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH THE THIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE (on behalf of CARSON FUTCH, WAYNE FUTCH, MORRIS FUTCH AND JANET FUTCH)

05/26/2021:ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE (on behalf of CARSON FUTCH, WAYNE FUTCH, MORRIS FUTCH AND JANET FUTCH)

EXHIBITS FILED (IRREVOCABLE TRUST AGREEMENT)

05/17/2021:EXHIBITS FILED (IRREVOCABLE TRUST AGREEMENT)

RESTATED AMENDMENT TO THE ALVIN C FUTCH REVOCABLE TRUST

05/14/2021:RESTATED AMENDMENT TO THE ALVIN C FUTCH REVOCABLE TRUST

PETITION FOR REMOVAL OF TRUSTEE

05/14/2021:PETITION FOR REMOVAL OF TRUSTEE

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketR. READ PEASLEE'S ANSWER TO PETITION FOR REMOVAL OF TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO PETITION FOR REMOVAL OF R. READ PEASLEE AS TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT CARSON FUTCH' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR REMOVAL OF TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO ADVANCE TRIAL ON THE DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION TO TRUSTEE'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO PAY ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS FROM TRUSTS AND MOTION FOR ORDER PROHIBITING USE OF TRUSTS' ASSETS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT TO PAY ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS FROM TRUSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF THIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketJudge: FEAGLE , MARK E Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE (on behalf of CARSON FUTCH, WAYNE FUTCH, MORRIS FUTCH AND JANET FUTCH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBITS FILED (IRREVOCABLE TRUST AGREEMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketJudge: BRYAN , PAUL S Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESTATED AMENDMENT TO THE ALVIN C FUTCH REVOCABLE TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR REMOVAL OF TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number CC 187883

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCase 122021CA000122CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEARN , STEVEN LEE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLER, MARK NELSON