This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 11/08/2019 at 15:01:19 (UTC).

PEARCE, CASSANDRA E VS PEARCE, PETE JEFFREY

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 PEARCE, CASSANDRA E filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PEARCE, PETE JEFFREY. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FEAGLE, MARK E and MARK FEAGLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FEAGLE, MARK E

MARK FEAGLE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PEARCE, CASSANDRA E

Respondent

PEARCE, PETE JEFFREY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CARTER, SARA JANE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2019
  • PETITIONER'S EXHIBIT 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Event FH scheduled on 11/7/2019 at 0300 PM, JC - Judge MARK FEAGLE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • ANSWER, WAIVER AND REQUEST FOR COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Judge: FEAGLE , MARK E Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • BASIC PARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY AND JURISDICTION ACT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Payment received: $408.00 Receipt Number CC 159232

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Case 122019DR000665DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less