This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 08/01/2019 at 22:04:08 (UTC).

OAKVIEW MOBILE HOME PARK VS BRADBARY, CARRIE Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/08/2019 OAKVIEW MOBILE HOME PARK filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against BRADBARY, CARRIE. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are COLEMAN, TOM and TOM COLEMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

COLEMAN, TOM

TOM COLEMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OAKVIEW MOBILE HOME PARK

Defendants

BRADBARY, ROBBIE

RAMOS, NOELLE OLQUIN

BRADBARY, CARRIE

BRADBARY, TRACEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

JACKSON, AIMEE BURDETTE

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE-FOR TRACEY BRADBARY, CARRIE BRADBARY, ROBBIE BRADBARY AND NOELLE OLQUIN RAMOS ON 07/08/2019 IND

07/09/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE-FOR TRACEY BRADBARY, CARRIE BRADBARY, ROBBIE BRADBARY AND NOELLE OLQUIN RAMOS ON 07/08/2019 IND

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/10/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

07/08/2019:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

RECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

07/08/2019:RECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT IN EVICTION

07/16/2019:MOTION FOR JUDGMENT IN EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED TO TRACEY BRADBARY, ROBBIE BRADBARY, CARRIE BRADBARY AND NOELLE OLQUIN RAMOS

07/08/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO TRACEY BRADBARY, ROBBIE BRADBARY, CARRIE BRADBARY AND NOELLE OLQUIN RAMOS

NOTICE OF HEARING

07/17/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Event HEARING scheduled on 7/24/2019 at 1000 AM, JC - Judge TOM COLEMAN presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • EMAILED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT IN EVICTION TO THE JUDGES OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR JUDGMENT IN EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT OF RENT TO BE POSTED WITH THE COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF TRACEY BRADBURY, CARRIE BRADBURY, ROBBIE BRADBURY AND NOELLE OLQUIN RAMOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2019
  • INITIAL NOTICE (3 DAY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Case 122019CC000903CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/8/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Judge: COLEMAN , TOM assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Event Date: 07/24/2019 10:00; Judge: COLEMAN, TOM; Docket Type: HEARING; Location: JC ROOM 239; Defendant Attorney: JACKSON, AIMEE BURDETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Event Date: 07/24/2019 10:00; Judge: COLEMAN, TOM; Docket Type: HEARING; Location: JC ROOM 239; Defendant Attorney: JACKSON, AIMEE BURDETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Event Date: 07/24/2019 10:00; Judge: COLEMAN, TOM; Docket Type: HEARING; Location: JC ROOM 239; Defendant Attorney: JACKSON, AIMEE BURDETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Event Date: 07/24/2019 10:00; Judge: COLEMAN, TOM; Docket Type: HEARING; Location: JC ROOM 239; Defendant Attorney: JACKSON, AIMEE BURDETTE

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.