This case was last updated from Third Circuit Courts - Columbia County on 09/08/2021 at 05:45:56 (UTC).

MOORE, JESTEN VS SEE, TONI D Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 MOORE, JESTEN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SEE, TONI D. This case was filed in Third Circuit Courts - Columbia County, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DOUGLAS, WESLEY RAYMOND and DOUGLAS, WESLEY R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DOUGLAS, WESLEY RAYMOND

DOUGLAS, WESLEY R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOORE, JESTEN

Defendants

SEE, TONI D

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE I

GEORGE, NICHOLAS A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BIGGART, JAMES GARRETT

Defendant Attorney

DURSTEIN, JAMES CONOR

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT'S DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

07/15/2021:DEFENDANT'S DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

DEFENSE COUNSEL'S NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY E-MAIL A DDRESS FOR SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS PURUSANT TO RULE 2.516(B)(1)

07/08/2021:DEFENSE COUNSEL'S NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY E-MAIL A DDRESS FOR SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS PURUSANT TO RULE 2.516(B)(1)

THIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

05/19/2021:THIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

05/13/2021:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

CERTIFICATE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

05/13/2021:CERTIFICATE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY C/O CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER AS REGISTERED AGENT

05/13/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY C/O CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER AS REGISTERED AGENT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO TONI D. SEE

05/13/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO TONI D. SEE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/13/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketORDER TO ISSUE SUMMONS AND PROCEED TO SERVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENSE COUNSEL'S NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY E-MAIL A DDRESS FOR SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS PURUSANT TO RULE 2.516(B)(1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT STATE FARM'S ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF NON SERVICE-TONI D. SEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS (NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY SERVED BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY 06-04-21)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH THE THIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketJudge: DOUGLAS , WESLEY R Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY C/O CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER AS REGISTERED AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO TONI D. SEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number CC 187743

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCase 122021CA000118CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BIGGART II ESQ, JAMES G