This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 07/20/2019 at 22:02:49 (UTC).

MITCHELL, MARIE Et Al VS SNEAD, DEREK

Case Summary

On 06/26/2019 MITCHELL, MARIE filed an Other lawsuit against SNEAD, DEREK. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLEMAN, TOM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLEMAN, TOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MITCHELL, MARIE

TERRY, LYDIA

Defendant

SNEAD, DEREK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACKSON, AIMEE BURDETTE

 

Court Documents

SECOND ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED FOR DEREK SNEAD

07/11/2019:SECOND ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED FOR DEREK SNEAD

RETURN OF NON SERVICE-FOR DEREK SNEAD ON 07/03/2019 NOT FOUND

07/11/2019:RETURN OF NON SERVICE-FOR DEREK SNEAD ON 07/03/2019 NOT FOUND

ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE ORDER GRANTING TEMPORARY INJUNCTION

06/28/2019:ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE ORDER GRANTING TEMPORARY INJUNCTION

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED DEREK SNEAD

06/28/2019:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED DEREK SNEAD

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

06/26/2019:APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

CERTIFICATION OF INDIGENCE

06/26/2019:CERTIFICATION OF INDIGENCE

COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND MONETARY DAMAGES

06/26/2019:COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND MONETARY DAMAGES

SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEREK SNEAD

06/26/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEREK SNEAD

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SECOND ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED FOR DEREK SNEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF NON SERVICE-FOR DEREK SNEAD ON 07/03/2019 NOT FOUND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED DEREK SNEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE ORDER GRANTING TEMPORARY INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Judge: COLEMAN , TOM Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEREK SNEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATION OF INDIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND MONETARY DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Case 122019CC000874CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less