This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 07/19/2019 at 18:01:55 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS WHITEHEAD, LELAND STEVEN

Case Summary

On 06/25/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WHITEHEAD, LELAND STEVEN. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are TOM COLEMAN and COLEMAN, TOM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

TOM COLEMAN

COLEMAN, TOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

WHITEHEAD, LELAND STEVEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OBI, VALERIA I.

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE- SERVED-LELAND WHITEHEAD (ALANNA WHITEHEAD, AS SPOUSE) SUB 07/02/2019

07/05/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE- SERVED-LELAND WHITEHEAD (ALANNA WHITEHEAD, AS SPOUSE) SUB 07/02/2019

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO LELAND WHITEHEAD

06/25/2019:SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO LELAND WHITEHEAD

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/25/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE- SERVED-LELAND WHITEHEAD (ALANNA WHITEHEAD, AS SPOUSE) SUB 07/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Event SMCL Pretrial scheduled on 10/2/2019 at 0900 AM, M1 - Judge TOM COLEMAN presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Judge: COLEMAN , TOM Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO LELAND WHITEHEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Payment received: $185.00 Receipt Number CC 152977

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Case 122019SC000867SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • Event Date: 10/02/2019 09:00; Judge: COLEMAN, TOM; Docket Type: SMCL Pretrial; Location: M1 COURTROOM 1

    Read MoreRead Less