This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 07/14/2020 at 12:22:23 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS DANIELS, LUCY

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DANIELS, LUCY. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are TOM COLEMAN and COLEMAN, TOM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

TOM COLEMAN

COLEMAN, TOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

DANIELS, LUCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOEHLE, KRISTINA BIANCA

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE- SERVED- FOR LUCY DANIELS ON 12/30/2019 SUB (CO-RESIDENT)

12/31/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE- SERVED- FOR LUCY DANIELS ON 12/30/2019 SUB (CO-RESIDENT)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/19/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/19/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/04/2020 10:00; Judge: COLEMAN, TOM; Docket Type: SMCL Pretrial; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE COURTROOM 1 COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR INSTALLMENT SETTLEMENT & ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISMISSING CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketPRE TRIAL WORKSHEET-STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event SMCL Pretrial on 3/4/2020 1000 AM Judge TOM COLEMAN results SETTLED on 3/4/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE- SERVED- FOR LUCY DANIELS ON 12/30/2019 SUB (CO-RESIDENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketEvent SMCL Pretrial scheduled on 3/4/2020 at 1000 AM, M1 - Judge TOM COLEMAN presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketJudge: COLEMAN , TOM Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION FOR LUCY DANIELS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number CC 162930

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCase 122019SC001690SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less