This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 09/09/2021 at 06:54:14 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. VS JOHNSON, CHARITA

Case Summary

On 07/14/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JOHNSON, CHARITA. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CARTER, SARA JANE, CARTER, SARA J and SARA CARTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CARTER, SARA JANE

CARTER, SARA J

SARA CARTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

Defendant

JOHNSON, CHARITA

Lake City, FL 32055-1137

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREEN, JOHAN ALEXI

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE- CHARITA JOHNSON SERVED 07/19/21 (INDV)

07/20/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE- CHARITA JOHNSON SERVED 07/19/21 (INDV)

PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED CHARITA JOHNSON

07/14/2021:PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED CHARITA JOHNSON

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/14/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/17/2021 09:00; Judge: CARTER, SARA J; Docket Type: SMCL Pretrial; Location: JUDGE'S CHAMBERS VIA ZO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE- CHARITA JOHNSON SERVED 07/19/21 (INDV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketEvent SMCL Pretrial scheduled on 11/17/2021 at 0900 AM, JC - Judge SARA CARTER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketJudge: CARTER , SARA J Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED CHARITA JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number CC 191303

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCase 122021SC000776SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREEN, JOHAN ALEXI