This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 07/08/2019 18:00:55

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/14/2019 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by LVNV FUNDING LLC against GOMEZ, HENRY in the jurisdiction of Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida.

Case Details

  • Case Number ****************AXMX
  • Filing Date 06/14/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Small Claim - Other Small Claim
  • Jurisdiction Columbia County Courts
  • Judge TOM COLEMAN
  • Courthouse Columbia County Courthouse
  • County Columbia
  • State Florida

Party Details

  • Plaintiff LVNV FUNDING LLC
  • Represented By
    • SCHERR, HAROLD EARL
  • Defendant GOMEZ, HENRY
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO HENRY...

06/14/2019:NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATI...

Free with Subscription

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2019
  • Event SMCL Pretrial scheduled on 9/18/2019 at 0900 AM, M1 - Judge TOM COLEMAN presiding.
  • 06/14/2019
  • Judge: COLEMAN , TOM Assigned
  • 06/14/2019
  • NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO HENRY GOMEZ
  • 06/14/2019
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM
  • 06/14/2019
  • Payment received: $185.00 Receipt Number CC 152424
  • 06/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00
  • 06/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00
  • 06/14/2019
  • Case 122019SC000822SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/14/2019
  • 09/18/2019
  • Event Date: 09/18/2019 09:00; Judge: COLEMAN, TOM; Docket Type: SMCL Pretrial; Location: M1 COURTROOM 1

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.