This case was last updated from Columbia County Florida Courts on 09/09/2021 at 04:20:13 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS EDENFIELD, TONIA

Case Summary

On 02/10/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against EDENFIELD, TONIA. This case was filed in Columbia County Florida Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CARTER, SARA J, SARA CARTER, BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN and BRYAN, PAUL S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CARTER, SARA J

SARA CARTER

BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN

BRYAN, PAUL S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

EDENFIELD, TONIA

Lake City, FL 32025-5077

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHERR, HAROLD EARL

Defendant Attorney

CHAUNCEY, ANTHONY WADE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/10/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO TONIA EDENFIELD

02/10/2021:PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO TONIA EDENFIELD

NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE

02/22/2021:NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE

DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE (RAN OUT OF TIME TO COMPLETE DILIGENT ATTEMPTS)

03/11/2021:DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE (RAN OUT OF TIME TO COMPLETE DILIGENT ATTEMPTS)

ORDER OF RECUSAL

03/19/2021:ORDER OF RECUSAL

MEMORANDUM OF REASSIGNMENT

03/22/2021:MEMORANDUM OF REASSIGNMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING APPEARANCE TO ADVISE COURT AND COUNSEL OF BANKRUPTCY FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF REASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketJudge: BRYAN , PAUL S Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketJudge: CARTER , SARA J Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF RECUSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/17/2021 09:00; Judge: CARTER, SARA J; Docket Type: SMCL Pretrial; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE COURTR; Defendant Attorney: CHAUNCEY, ANTHONY W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event SMCL Pretrial on 3/17/2021 0900 AM Judge SARA CARTER results CONTINUED on 3/17/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketJUDGE CARTER WILL BE RECUSING HERSELF FROM THIS CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketEvent SMCL Pretrial scheduled on 3/17/2021 at 0900 AM, M1 - Judge SARA CARTER presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketJudge: CARTER , SARA J Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number CC 182278

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO TONIA EDENFIELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCase 122021SC000132SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/10/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less