This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 11/02/2019 at 15:01:43 (UTC).

LUCAS, ARDENIA GIBSON VS LUCAS, NATHANIEL

Case Summary

On 10/09/2019 LUCAS, ARDENIA GIBSON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LUCAS, NATHANIEL. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DOUGLAS, WESLEY R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DOUGLAS, WESLEY R

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LUCAS, ARDENIA GIBSON

Respondent

LUCAS, NATHANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CONNER, JEFFREY ALLEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE-NATHANIEL LUCAS UNSERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • Judge: DOUGLAS , WESLEY R Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • STANDING FAMILY LAW ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT OF WIFE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • Case 122019DR000653DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/9/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CONNER, JEFFREY ALLEN