This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 07/18/2019 at 15:03:16 (UTC).

LUCAS, ALLIE MAE VS LUCAS, NICHOLAS

Case Summary

On 06/24/2019 LUCAS, ALLIE MAE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LUCAS, NICHOLAS. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DOUGLAS, WESLEY R and WESLEY DOUGLAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DOUGLAS, WESLEY R

WESLEY DOUGLAS

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LUCAS, ALLIE MAE

Respondent

LUCAS, NICHOLAS

Not Classified By Court

ZAHORIK, ALLIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DEVALL, STACEY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • ORDER ON WIFE'S VERIFIED MOTION FOR EMERGENCY HEARING, MOTION FOR TEMPORARY NEEDS AND FACULTIES AND MOTION FOR PICK UP ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • FAX FROM NICHOLAS LUCAS REGARDING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • COVER LETTER TO SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT COUNTY OF NORTH CAROLINA AND MONEY ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Event MOTION HEARING scheduled on 7/9/2019 at 1100 AM, JC - Judge WESLEY DOUGLAS presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • EMERGENCY VERIFIED MOTION FOR CHILD PICK UP ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • COVER LETTER TO SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT COUNTY OF CLEVELAND NC WITH MONEY ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • COPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • BASIC PARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY AND JURISDICTION ACT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILD(REN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO NICHOLAS LUCAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Judge: DOUGLAS , WESLEY R Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $418.00 Balance Remaining $418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Case 122019DR000395DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less