This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 11/30/2019 at 15:01:54 (UTC).

LINK, CATHERINE RENEE VS LINK, ADAM DAVID

Case Summary

On 11/06/2019 LINK, CATHERINE RENEE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LINK, ADAM DAVID. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DOUGLAS, WESLEY R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DOUGLAS, WESLEY R

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LINK, CATHERINE RENEE

Respondent

LINK, ADAM DAVID

Not Classified By Court

HODSON, CATHERINE RENEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CONNER, JEFFREY ALLEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $418.00 Balance Remaining $418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketJudge: DOUGLAS , WESLEY R Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR CONFIDENTIAL FILING OF ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY AND JURISDICTION ACT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ADAM LINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketCase 122019DR000729DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/6/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CONNER, JEFFREY ALLEN