This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 11/09/2019 at 15:00:37 (UTC).

LAW, CARLISSA JENAY VS BRADLEY, BYRON

Case Summary

On 10/16/2019 LAW, CARLISSA JENAY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BRADLEY, BYRON. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DOUGLAS, WESLEY R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DOUGLAS, WESLEY R

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LAW, CARLISSA JENAY

Respondent

BRADLEY, BYRON

Not Classified By Court

LAW, CARLISSA J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2019
  • ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • LETTER FROM CASE MANAGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • ANSWER FROM BYRON BRADLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE-BYRON BRADLEY SERVED 10/21/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $418.00 Balance Remaining $418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • COVER LETTER TO SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT COUNTY OF UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • PROCESS SERVICE MEMORANDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • COPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2019
  • NOTICE OF FILING CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY AND JURISDICTION ACT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • NOTICE OF FILING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILD(REN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Judge: DOUGLAS , WESLEY R Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Case 122019DR000670DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less