This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 07/14/2020 at 11:11:58 (UTC).

LANDMARK FINCIAL SERVICES, LLC VS HAMMAC, ASHLEY Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 LANDMARK FINCIAL SERVICES, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HAMMAC, ASHLEY. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are TOM COLEMAN and COLEMAN, TOM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

TOM COLEMAN

COLEMAN, TOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LANDMARK FINCIAL SERVICES, LLC

Defendants

SNOWDEN, CHANCE

HAMMAC, ASHLEY

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE- FOR CHANCE SNOWDEN ON 12/09/2019 IND

12/11/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE- FOR CHANCE SNOWDEN ON 12/09/2019 IND

RETURN OF SERVICE- FOR ASHLEY HAMMAC ON 12/09/2019 SUB (CHANCE SNOWDEN)

12/11/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE- FOR ASHLEY HAMMAC ON 12/09/2019 SUB (CHANCE SNOWDEN)

PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO ASHLEY HAMMAC

12/06/2019:PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO ASHLEY HAMMAC

PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO CHANCE SNOWDEN

12/06/2019:PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO CHANCE SNOWDEN

RECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

12/06/2019:RECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE- FOR CHANCE SNOWDEN

12/06/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE- FOR CHANCE SNOWDEN

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE- FOR ASHLEY HAMMAC

12/06/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE- FOR ASHLEY HAMMAC

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 02/19/2020 09:00; Judge: COLEMAN, TOM; Docket Type: SMCL Pretrial; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE COURTROOM 1 COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketPRE TRIAL WORKSHEET (CHANCE SNOWDEN)-CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketPRE TRIAL WORKSHEET (ASHLEY HAMMAC)-CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event SMCL Pretrial on 2/19/2020 0900 AM Judge TOM COLEMAN results CONTINUED on 2/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE- FOR CHANCE SNOWDEN ON 12/09/2019 IND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE- FOR ASHLEY HAMMAC ON 12/09/2019 SUB (CHANCE SNOWDEN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO ASHLEY HAMMAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO CHANCE SNOWDEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $195.00 Receipt Number CC 162230

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketActive Process SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketActive Process SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketActive Process SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE- FOR CHANCE SNOWDEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE- FOR ASHLEY HAMMAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketEvent SMCL Pretrial scheduled on 2/19/2020 at 0900 AM, M1 - Judge TOM COLEMAN presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJudge: COLEMAN , TOM Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase 122019SC001623SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/6/2019

    Read MoreRead Less