This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 10/15/2020 at 18:11:04 (UTC).

LAKE SHORE HMA LLC DBA SHANDS VS HERRELL, GARY

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 LAKE SHORE HMA LLC DBA SHANDS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HERRELL, GARY. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are TOM COLEMAN and COLEMAN, TOM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

TOM COLEMAN

COLEMAN, TOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAKE SHORE HMA LLC DBA SHANDS

Defendant

HERRELL, GARY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLINTON, J PAUL

 

Court Documents

PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO GARY HERRELL

09/21/2020:PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO GARY HERRELL

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/21/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/04/2020 09:00; Judge: COLEMAN, TOM; Docket Type: SMCL Pretrial; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketEvent SMCL Pretrial scheduled on 11/4/2020 at 0900 AM, M1 - Judge TOM COLEMAN presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketJudge: COLEMAN , TOM Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number CC 175726

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO GARY HERRELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF PROVIDING EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase 122020SC000900SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less