This case was last updated from Third Circuit Courts - Columbia County on 09/08/2021 at 05:58:16 (UTC).

JUNE, GERALD VS STRAIT, PRESTON

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 JUNE, GERALD filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against STRAIT, PRESTON. This case was filed in Third Circuit Courts - Columbia County, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN, BRYAN, PAUL S, GRIFFIN, JENNIFER K and JENNIFER GRIFFIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN

BRYAN, PAUL S

GRIFFIN, JENNIFER K

JENNIFER GRIFFIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUNE, GERALD

Defendant

STRAIT, PRESTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WELLER, THOMAS RAY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

08/31/2021:NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

08/26/2021:ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

COVER LETTER TO CLERK

08/23/2021:COVER LETTER TO CLERK

RESPONSE FROM PRESTON STRAIT

08/20/2021:RESPONSE FROM PRESTON STRAIT

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

08/18/2021:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST PRESTON STRAIT

08/18/2021:DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST PRESTON STRAIT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

08/18/2021:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

08/17/2021:NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF PUBLICATION (NOTICE OF ACTION)

07/26/2021:NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF PUBLICATION (NOTICE OF ACTION)

NOTICE OF ACTION

07/09/2021:NOTICE OF ACTION

NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE RETURN

07/09/2021:NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE RETURN

RETURN OF NON SERVICE-PRESTON STRAIT

06/18/2021:RETURN OF NON SERVICE-PRESTON STRAIT

ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH THE THIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

06/14/2021:ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH THE THIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSURE A MORTGAGE

06/02/2021:COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSURE A MORTGAGE

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED TO PRESTON STRAIT

06/22/2021:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED TO PRESTON STRAIT

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

06/02/2021:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PRESTON STRAIGHT

06/02/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO PRESTON STRAIGHT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/02/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 10/14/2021 13:30; Judge: GRIFFIN, JENNIFER K; Docket Type: SUMMARY JUDGMENT HE; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE MAIN C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 09/30/2021 13:30; Judge: GRIFFIN, JENNIFER K; Docket Type: CASE MANAGEMENT; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE MAIN C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketEvent CASE MANAGEMENT scheduled on 9/30/2021 at 0130 PM, M1 - Judge JENNIFER GRIFFIN presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT SUPPORTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS AND FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEvent SUMMARY JUDGMENT HE scheduled on 10/14/2021 at 0130 PM, M1 - Judge JENNIFER GRIFFIN presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketORDER SCHEDULING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketJudge: BRYAN , PAUL S Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL NOTE CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO PRESTON STRAIGHT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT TO FORECLOSURE A MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $920.00 Receipt Number CC 188947

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $920.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $920.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCase 122021CA000131CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/2/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WELLER, THOMAS RAY