This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 08/01/2019 at 15:00:53 (UTC).

JONES, ELDON VANCE VS JONES, KIMAYETTA

Case Summary

On 07/08/2019 JONES, ELDON VANCE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JONES, KIMAYETTA. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DOUGLAS, WESLEY R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DOUGLAS, WESLEY R

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JONES, ELDON VANCE

Respondent

JONES, KIMAYETTA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2019
  • LETTER FROM CASE MANAGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE-KIMAYETTA JONES UNSERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $418.00 Balance Remaining $418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • COVER LETTER TO SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT COUNTY OF DUVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • COPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT OF HUSBAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO KIMAYETTA JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Judge: DOUGLAS , WESLEY R Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Case 122019DR000436DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/8/2019

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.