This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 07/18/2019 at 22:00:17 (UTC).

JOHNSON, GARY VS WEBB, CATRICE

Case Summary

On 06/24/2019 JOHNSON, GARY filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against WEBB, CATRICE. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLEMAN, TOM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLEMAN, TOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNSON, GARY

Defendant

WEBB, CATRICE

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION SERVED

07/10/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION SERVED

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

07/03/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT IN EVICTION

07/03/2019:MOTION FOR JUDGMENT IN EVICTION

RETURN OF SERVICE-FOR CATRICE WEBB ON 06/24/2019 IND

06/25/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE-FOR CATRICE WEBB ON 06/24/2019 IND

RECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

06/24/2019:RECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CATRICE WEBB

06/24/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO CATRICE WEBB

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • EMAILED DFJ TO JUDGES OFFICE. MG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR JUDGMENT IN EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • EMAIL TO THE JUDGES OFFICE RE: MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT. TN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • MOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT OF RENT TO DEPOSIT INTO REGISTRY OF COURT. TN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • ANSWER FROM CATRICE WEBB. TN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE-FOR CATRICE WEBB ON 06/24/2019 IND

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO CATRICE WEBB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION WITH ATTACHED LEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • INITIAL NOTICE (3DAY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Case 122019CC000855CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Judge: COLEMAN , TOM assigned

    Read MoreRead Less