Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Third Circuit Courts - Columbia County on 02/21/2021 at 20:01:05 (UTC).

JACKSON, RICHARD B VS JEWITT, TIMOTHY

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 JACKSON, RICHARD B filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JEWITT, TIMOTHY. This case was filed in Third Circuit Courts - Columbia County, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DOUGLAS, WESLEY RAYMOND and DOUGLAS, WESLEY R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Third Circuit Courts - Columbia County

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DOUGLAS, WESLEY RAYMOND

DOUGLAS, WESLEY R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JACKSON, RICHARD B

Defendant

JEWITT, TIMOTHY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BUTLER, RACHEL CAROLINE

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE TO COUNTY COURT

01/29/2021:ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE TO COUNTY COURT

MOTION TO TRANSFER TO COUNTY COURT

01/29/2021:MOTION TO TRANSFER TO COUNTY COURT

COMPLAINT

01/28/2021:COMPLAINT

RECEIPT OF TRANSFER TO COUNTY COURT-RECVD BY DC, SHAE MULBERRY ON 02-02-21

02/02/2021:RECEIPT OF TRANSFER TO COUNTY COURT-RECVD BY DC, SHAE MULBERRY ON 02-02-21

SUMMONS ISSUED TO TIMOTHY P. JEWITT, SR.

01/28/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO TIMOTHY P. JEWITT, SR.

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/28/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT OF TRANSFER TO COUNTY COURT-RECVD BY DC, SHAE MULBERRY ON 02-02-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE TO COUNTY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO TRANSFER TO COUNTY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketJudge: DOUGLAS , WESLEY R Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number CC 181654

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO TIMOTHY P. JEWITT, SR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCase 122021CA000025CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUTLER, RACHEL CAROLINE