This case was last updated from Columbia County - Third Judicial Circuit Court on 07/14/2020 at 14:58:47 (UTC).

INDICTOR, LISA MARIE VS MCKENNEY, JONI MARIE

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 INDICTOR, LISA MARIE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MCKENNEY, JONI MARIE. This case was filed in Columbia County - Third Judicial Circuit Court , Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FEAGLE, MARK E, MARK FEAGLE and FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FEAGLE, MARK E

MARK FEAGLE

FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INDICTOR, LISA MARIE

Defendant

MCKENNEY, JONI MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TISON, DEVIN PAUL

Defendant Attorney

ROBINSON, BRUCE WAYNE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/21/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/21/2020:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO JONI MARI MCKENNEY

01/21/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO JONI MARI MCKENNEY

RETURN OF SERVICE- JONI MARIE MCKENNEY SERVED 02-15-20 (INDV)

02/25/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE- JONI MARIE MCKENNEY SERVED 02-15-20 (INDV)

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT, JONI MARIE MCKENNEY

03/03/2020:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT, JONI MARIE MCKENNEY

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL

03/03/2020:DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL

PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT, JONI MARIE MCKENNEY'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/03/2020:PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT, JONI MARIE MCKENNEY'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF

03/25/2020:DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

03/25/2020:DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVING PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

04/02/2020:NOTICE OF SERVING PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF AUTOMOBILE INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

04/02/2020:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF AUTOMOBILE INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

04/27/2020:DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

DEFENDANT'S FIRST NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW

05/18/2020:DEFENDANT'S FIRST NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL OF NON-OBJECTION TO FIRST NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 13519E)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S FIRST NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE TO COURT OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 06/16/2020 14:00; Judge: FEAGLE, MARK E; Docket Type: HEARING; Location: JUDGE'S CHAMBERS ROOM 2; Defendant Attorney: ROBINSON, BRUCE WAYNE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 6/16/2020 at 0200 PM, JC - Judge MARK FEAGLE presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S FIRST NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT, JONI MARIE MCKENNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE- JONI MARIE MCKENNEY SERVED 02-15-20 (INDV)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketJudge: FEAGLE , MARK E Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO JONI MARI MCKENNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number CC 164484

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCase 122020CA000015CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/21/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tison, Devin P