This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 11/10/2019 at 15:01:14 (UTC).

HUTCHINS, HALA JABRA VS HUTCHINS, RICHARD KEITH

Case Summary

On 10/23/2019 HUTCHINS, HALA JABRA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HUTCHINS, RICHARD KEITH. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DOUGLAS, WESLEY R and JENNIFER GRIFFIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DOUGLAS, WESLEY R

JENNIFER GRIFFIN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HUTCHINS, HALA JABRA

Respondent

HUTCHINS, RICHARD KEITH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2019
  • Event FH scheduled on 11/25/2019 at 0145 PM, MX - Judge JENNIFER GRIFFIN presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • COPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE HALA HUTCHINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • MOTION TO SET FINAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER RICHARD HUTCHINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT RICHARD HUTCHINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • ANSWER, WAIVER AND REQUEST FOR COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DISCLOSURE FROM NON LAWYER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • RECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • Payment received: $408.00 Receipt Number CC 159765

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • Case 122019DR000683DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • Judge: DOUGLAS , WESLEY R assigned

    Read MoreRead Less