This case was last updated from Columbia County - Third Judicial Circuit Court on 07/14/2020 at 13:53:56 (UTC).

HUFF, ALLISON VS ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 HUFF, ALLISON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Columbia County - Third Judicial Circuit Court , Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD and FEAGLE, MARK E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD

FEAGLE, MARK E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HUFF, ALLISON

Defendant

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELLIS, CHELSEA LAUREN

Defendant Attorney

WRIGHT, VIRGIL WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/15/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/15/2020:COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

01/15/2020:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

01/15/2020:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

01/15/2020:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY C/O CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER AS REGISTERED AGENT

01/15/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY C/O CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER AS REGISTERED AGENT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL

02/25/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/25/2020:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

DEFENDANT, ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF

03/06/2020:DEFENDANT, ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANT, ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF

03/06/2020:DEFENDANT, ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANT, ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

03/06/2020:DEFENDANT, ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES

04/06/2020:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT(S) NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM NON-PARTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT(S) NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM NON PARTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT, ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE DEFENDANT, ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number CC 164234

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY C/O CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER AS REGISTERED AGENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketCase 122020CA000012CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/15/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ellis, Chelsea Lauren