This case was last updated from Third Circuit Courts - Columbia County on 11/15/2021 at 21:54:32 (UTC).

HOLTON, FRANK Et Al VS SOUTHERN COOKING INC

Case Summary

On 12/28/2017 HOLTON, FRANK filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SOUTHERN COOKING INC. This case was filed in Third Circuit Courts - Columbia County, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN, PAUL BRYAN, DECKER, ANDREW J III, DECKER III, ANDREW J and BRYAN, PAUL S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN

PAUL BRYAN

DECKER, ANDREW J III

DECKER III, ANDREW J

BRYAN, PAUL S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HOLTON, KATELIA

HOLTON, FRANK

Defendant

SOUTHERN COOKING INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEINER, IAN ANDREW

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

12/28/2017:COMPLAINT

ORDER SETTING CASE FOR JURY TRIAL AND FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING MATTERS TO BE COMPLETED PRIOR TO BE COMPLETED PRIOR TO PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

11/02/2021:ORDER SETTING CASE FOR JURY TRIAL AND FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING MATTERS TO BE COMPLETED PRIOR TO BE COMPLETED PRIOR TO PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE

08/05/2021:ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

07/26/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES

03/08/2021:PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES

DEFENDANT'S CERTIFICATION OF NON-OBJECTION AND COMPLIANCE WITH HIPPA

03/01/2021:DEFENDANT'S CERTIFICATION OF NON-OBJECTION AND COMPLIANCE WITH HIPPA

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

02/01/2021:DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S UPDATE INTERROGATORIES

02/01/2021:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S UPDATE INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S FOURTH REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/14/2021:PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S FOURTH REQUEST TO PRODUCE

DEFENDANT'S FOURTH REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF, FRANK HOLTON

12/17/2020:DEFENDANT'S FOURTH REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF, FRANK HOLTON

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/03/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S UPDATE INTERROGATORIES

11/06/2020:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S UPDATE INTERROGATORIES

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UPDATE INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

10/30/2020:DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UPDATE INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/30/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

AMENDED NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD & DIRECTIONS TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATION

05/10/2019:AMENDED NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD & DIRECTIONS TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATION

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD & DIRECTIONS TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATION

05/06/2019:NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD & DIRECTIONS TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF LOSS OF CONSORTIUM INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, KATELIA HOLTON PROPOUNDED ON JANUARY 25, 2018

01/25/2018:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF LOSS OF CONSORTIUM INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, KATELIA HOLTON PROPOUNDED ON JANUARY 25, 2018

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING AMENDED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES

04/20/2018:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING AMENDED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 09/06/2022 09:00; Judge: BRYAN, PAUL S; Docket Type: JURY TRIAL; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE MAIN C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 07/12/2022 15:00; Judge: BRYAN, PAUL S; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: JUDGE'S CHAMBERS VIA ZO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEvent PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 7/12/2022 at 0300 PM, JC - Judge PAUL BRYAN presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEvent JURY TRIAL scheduled on 9/6/2022 at 0900 AM, M1 - Judge PAUL BRYAN presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING CASE FOR JURY TRIAL AND FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING MATTERS TO BE COMPLETED PRIOR TO BE COMPLETED PRIOR TO PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketAGREED ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION PURSUANT TO RULE 1.360

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 10/12/2021 15:00; Judge: BRYAN, PAUL S; Docket Type: STATUS CONFERENCE; Location: JUDGE'S CHAMBERS VIA ZO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE TO SUBMIT TO COMPULSORY MEDICAL ORTHOPEDIC EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF, FRANK HOLTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
105 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE- FOR SOUTHERN COOKING INC. C/O REGISTERED AGENT ON 1/9/18 SUB (CASSIE EDENFIELD-EMPLOYEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketJudge: DECKER III, ANDREW J Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO SOUTHERN COOKING, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number CC 123166

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketCase 122017CA000424CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEINER ESQ, IAN A