This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 11/10/2019 at 14:31:12 (UTC).

HATFIELD, ANDERSON E, LANGFORD, TROY KAYLE Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/18/2019 HATFIELD, ANDERSON E, LANGFORD, TROY KAYLE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is OLIN, MELISSA G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

OLIN, MELISSA G

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LANGFORD, TROY KAYLE JR

Decedent

LANGFORD, TROY KAYLE

Not Classified By Court

HATFIELD, ANDERSON E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HATFIELD, ANDERSON E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE (Original)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • COVER LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • LETTER FROM GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • COVER LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • Judge: OLIN , MELISSA G Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION (With attached copy of Death Certificate)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Payment received: $345.00 Receipt Number CC 159527

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Case 122019CP000271CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hatfield, Anderson E III