This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 10/07/2021 at 15:04:10 (UTC).

HARRIS, MARC JEFFREY VS HARRIS, TERRI ANN

Case Summary

On 09/14/2021 HARRIS, MARC JEFFREY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HARRIS, TERRI ANN. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DOUGLAS, WESLEY R and DOUGLAS, WESLEY RAYMOND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DOUGLAS, WESLEY R

DOUGLAS, WESLEY RAYMOND

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HARRIS, MARC JEFFREY

Respondent

HARRIS, TERRI ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BELANGER, KRISTINA

Respondent Attorney

BUTLER, RACHEL CAROLINE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR CIVIL CONTEMPT/ENFORCEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketANSWER TO PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketJudge: DOUGLAS , WESLEY R Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO TERI HARRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $418.00 Receipt Number CC 194404

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $418.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCase 122021DR000448DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUTLER, RACHEL CAROLINE