This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 01/22/2021 at 15:03:24 (UTC).

HARRIS, JALEEL MENENDEZ VS HILL, PATTRICE ILENE

Case Summary

On 12/29/2020 HARRIS, JALEEL MENENDEZ filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against HILL, PATTRICE ILENE. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DOUGLAS, WESLEY RAYMOND and DOUGLAS, WESLEY R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DOUGLAS, WESLEY RAYMOND

DOUGLAS, WESLEY R

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HARRIS, JALEEL MENENDEZ

Respondent

HILL, PATTRICE ILENE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketANSWER FROM PATRICE HILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE- SUMMONS SERVED: PATTRICE HILL 01-05-2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION OF PARENTING CLASS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO PATTICE HILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketBASIC PARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY AND JURISDICTION ACT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketPETITION TO ESTABLISH PATERNITY, CHILD SUPPORT AND FOR OTHER RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCase 122020DR000632DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketJudge: DOUGLAS , WESLEY R assigned

    Read MoreRead Less