This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 07/26/2019 at 15:00:33 (UTC).

HARRIS, CLIFFORD VS SLAUGHTER, VIVIAN

Case Summary

On 07/02/2019 HARRIS, CLIFFORD filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SLAUGHTER, VIVIAN. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DOUGLAS, WESLEY R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DOUGLAS, WESLEY R

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HARRIS, CLIFFORD

Respondent

SLAUGHTER, VIVIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CALVIN, EMILY RAE

Respondent Attorney

CANCIO, ANGELA MARIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE- VIVIAN SLAUGHTER SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE- VIVIAN SLAUGHTER SERVED 07-08-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • ANSWER TO PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Judge: DOUGLAS , WESLEY R Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • NOTICE OF FILING STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO VIVIAN SLAUGHTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Case 122019DR000426DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/2/2019

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.