This case was last updated from Third Circuit Courts - Columbia County on 09/08/2021 at 05:58:01 (UTC).

GREY BUILDING LLC VS HIBU INC

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 GREY BUILDING LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HIBU INC. This case was filed in Third Circuit Courts - Columbia County, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD and FEAGLE, MARK E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD

FEAGLE, MARK E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREY BUILDING LLC

Defendant

HIBU INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MITTAUER, RYAN JOSEPH

Defendant Attorney

SPRECHMAN, STEVEN BRUCE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/04/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED TO HIBU, INC. C/O C T CORPORATION SYSTEM

06/04/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO HIBU, INC. C/O C T CORPORATION SYSTEM

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

06/04/2021:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

COMPLAINT

06/04/2021:COMPLAINT

ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH THE THIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

06/16/2021:ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH THE THIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/23/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COMPLAINT

06/23/2021:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH ORDER OF COURT

06/23/2021:NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH ORDER OF COURT

ORDER CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER WITH ATTACHED PLAN AND PROCEDURES

07/02/2021:ORDER CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER WITH ATTACHED PLAN AND PROCEDURES

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER WITH ATTACHED PLAN AND PROCEDURES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH ORDER OF COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH THE THIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketJudge: FEAGLE , MARK E Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO HIBU, INC. C/O C T CORPORATION SYSTEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $419.00 Receipt Number CC 189080

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $419.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $419.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCase 122021CA000135CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/4/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HIBU INC FORMERLY KNOWN AS YELLOW BOOK SALES AND DISTRIBUTION COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sprechman, Steven B., ESQ.