This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 08/01/2019 at 22:04:01 (UTC).

GARRETT, MISTY MCDANIEL VS POPE, BRENDA

Case Summary

On 07/08/2019 GARRETT, MISTY MCDANIEL filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against POPE, BRENDA. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLEMAN, TOM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLEMAN, TOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARRETT, MISTY MCDANIEL

Defendant

POPE, BRENDA

Not Classified By Court

MCDANIEL, MISTY JONNEA

MCDANIEL GARRETT, MISTY JONNEA

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION WITH ATTACHED LEASE

07/08/2019:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION WITH ATTACHED LEASE

RECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

07/08/2019:RECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

INITIAL NOTICE (3DAY)

07/08/2019:INITIAL NOTICE (3DAY)

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST BRENDA POPE

07/16/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST BRENDA POPE

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT IN EVICTION

07/16/2019:MOTION FOR JUDGMENT IN EVICTION

RETURN OF SERVICE-FOR BRENDA POPE ON 07/08/2019 SUB (GAVIN JOHNSON)

07/11/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE-FOR BRENDA POPE ON 07/08/2019 SUB (GAVIN JOHNSON)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

07/22/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

WRIT OF POSSESSION SERVED

07/30/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION SERVED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO BRENDA POPE

07/08/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO BRENDA POPE

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • EMAILED DFJ TO JUDGES OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR JUDGMENT IN EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST BRENDA POPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • EMAILED ANSWER FROM DEFENDANT TO JUDGES OFFICE.MG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • ANSWER FROM DEFENDANT AND OTHERS ON HER BEHALF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE-FOR BRENDA POPE ON 07/08/2019 SUB (GAVIN JOHNSON)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO BRENDA POPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION WITH ATTACHED LEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL NOTICE (3DAY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Case 122019CC000904CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/8/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Judge: COLEMAN , TOM assigned

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.