This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 03/20/2021 at 15:02:44 (UTC).

FOSTER, MAYA NIKOLE VS WYCHE, XAVIER AMOS

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 FOSTER, MAYA NIKOLE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against WYCHE, XAVIER AMOS. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRYAN, PAUL S, PAUL BRYAN and BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRYAN, PAUL S

PAUL BRYAN

BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FOSTER, MAYA NIKOLE

Respondent

WYCHE, XAVIER AMOS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketORDER DISMISSING INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCLERKS WORKSHEET - JUDICIAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketTELETYPE RECEIVED FROM ALACHUA COUNTY PROTECTION ORDER SERVED: 03-01-2021- XAVIER WYCHE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketPETITIONERS CONTACT INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketPETITIONERS COPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCOVER LETTER TO SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT COUNTY OF ALACHUA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketEvent INJUNCTION HEAR scheduled on 3/9/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge PAUL BRYAN presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION OF DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCase 122021DR000044DVAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketJudge: BRYAN , PAUL S assigned

    Read MoreRead Less