This case was last updated from Columbia County - Third Judicial Circuit Court on 02/28/2022 at 06:43:48 (UTC).

FIRST FEDERAL BANK VS CURTIS, TONY Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/10/2021 FIRST FEDERAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CURTIS, TONY. This case was filed in Columbia County - Third Judicial Circuit Court , Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FEAGLE, MARK E, OLIN, MELISSA GATES, DOUGLAS, WESLEY R, OLIN, MELISSA G and MELISSA OLIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FEAGLE, MARK E

OLIN, MELISSA GATES

DOUGLAS, WESLEY R

OLIN, MELISSA G

MELISSA OLIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST FEDERAL BANK

Defendants

MONSTA CLOTHING COMPANY INC

CURTIS, TONY

WILSON, TYLER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WULBERN, ALLAN EDWARD

Defendant Attorney

ROBINSON, KRIS BRADSHAW

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/10/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED TO MONSTA CLOTHING COMPANY, INC.

11/10/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO MONSTA CLOTHING COMPANY, INC.

SUMMONS ISSUED TO TONY CURTIS

11/10/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO TONY CURTIS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO TYLER WILSON

11/10/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO TYLER WILSON

COMPLAINT

11/10/2021:COMPLAINT

RETURN OF SERVICE- TONY CURTIS SERVED 11/18/21 (SUB-CHASE CURTIS, SON)

11/23/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE- TONY CURTIS SERVED 11/18/21 (SUB-CHASE CURTIS, SON)

RETURN OF SERVICE- TYLER WILSON SERVED 11/18/21 (INDV)

11/23/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE- TYLER WILSON SERVED 11/18/21 (INDV)

RETURN OF SERVICE- MONSTA CLOTHING COMPANY C/O CHRISTIAN CUADRAS SERVED 11/24/21 (CORP-MICHELLE CUADRAS, SPOUSE)

11/29/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE- MONSTA CLOTHING COMPANY C/O CHRISTIAN CUADRAS SERVED 11/24/21 (CORP-MICHELLE CUADRAS, SPOUSE)

DEFENDANT, TYLER WILSON'S, MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT III

12/20/2021:DEFENDANT, TYLER WILSON'S, MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT III

ORDER OF RECUSAL

02/01/2022:ORDER OF RECUSAL

MEMORANDUM OF REASSIGNMENT

02/01/2022:MEMORANDUM OF REASSIGNMENT

ORDER OF RECUSAL

02/01/2022:ORDER OF RECUSAL

MEMORANDUM OF REASSIGNMENT

02/02/2022:MEMORANDUM OF REASSIGNMENT

NOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM

02/16/2022:NOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/14/2022 09:00; Judge: OLIN, MELISSA G; Docket Type: HEARING; Location: JUDGE'S CHAMBERS VIA ZO; Defendant Attorney: ROBINSON, KRIS B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketORDER ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 3/14/2022 at 0900 AM, JC - Judge MELISSA OLIN presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketJudge: OLIN , MELISSA G Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF REASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF RECUSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketJudge: DOUGLAS , WESLEY R Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF REASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketJudge: FEAGLE , MARK E Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $430.00 Receipt Number CC 197791

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $430.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO TYLER WILSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO TONY CURTIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO MONSTA CLOTHING COMPANY, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $430.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCase 122021CA000292CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/10/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less