This case was last updated from Columbia County - Third Judicial Circuit Court on 02/28/2022 at 06:43:36 (UTC).

FIRST FEDERAL BANK VS CUADRAS, MICHELLE Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/10/2021 FIRST FEDERAL BANK filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CUADRAS, MICHELLE. This case was filed in Columbia County - Third Judicial Circuit Court , Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DOUGLAS, WESLEY RAYMOND, DOUGLAS, WESLEY R and WESLEY DOUGLAS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DOUGLAS, WESLEY RAYMOND

DOUGLAS, WESLEY R

WESLEY DOUGLAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST FEDERAL BANK

Defendants

MONSTA CLOTHING COMPANY INC

CURTIS, TONY

CURTIS, CAROLYN

CUADRAS, MICHELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WULBERN, ALLAN EDWARD

Defendant Attorney

CHAUNCEY, ANTHONY WADE

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

01/20/2022:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF HEARING

01/05/2022:NOTICE OF HEARING

RETURNED MAIL -MONSTA CLOTHING COMPANY

12/30/2021:RETURNED MAIL -MONSTA CLOTHING COMPANY

RETURNED MAIL -TONY CURTIS

12/30/2021:RETURNED MAIL -TONY CURTIS

RETURNED MAIL -CAROLYN CURTIS

12/30/2021:RETURNED MAIL -CAROLYN CURTIS

FIRST FEDERAL BANK'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

12/22/2021:FIRST FEDERAL BANK'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

VERIFIED COMPLAINT

11/10/2021:VERIFIED COMPLAINT

RETURN OF SERVICE- MONSTA CLOTHING COMPANY C/O CHRISTIAN CUADRAS SERVED 11/24/21 (CORP-MICHELLE CUADRAS, SPOUSE)

11/29/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE- MONSTA CLOTHING COMPANY C/O CHRISTIAN CUADRAS SERVED 11/24/21 (CORP-MICHELLE CUADRAS, SPOUSE)

RETURN OF SERVICE- CAROLYN CURTIS SERVED 11/18/21 (SUB-CHASE CURTIS, SON)

11/23/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE- CAROLYN CURTIS SERVED 11/18/21 (SUB-CHASE CURTIS, SON)

RETURN OF SERVICE- TONY CURTIS SERVED 11/18/21 (SUB-CHASE CURTIS, SON)

11/23/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE- TONY CURTIS SERVED 11/18/21 (SUB-CHASE CURTIS, SON)

RETURN OF SERVICE- MICHELLE CUADRAS SERVED 11/18/21 (SUB-DOMINIC CUADRAS, SON)

11/23/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE- MICHELLE CUADRAS SERVED 11/18/21 (SUB-DOMINIC CUADRAS, SON)

COVER LETTER TO CLERK

11/16/2021:COVER LETTER TO CLERK

RECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

11/15/2021:RECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

RECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

11/15/2021:RECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO MICHELLE CUADRAS

11/10/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO MICHELLE CUADRAS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CAROLYN CURTIS

11/10/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO CAROLYN CURTIS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO TONY CURTIS

11/10/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO TONY CURTIS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO MONSTA CLOTHING COMPANY, INC.

11/10/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO MONSTA CLOTHING COMPANY, INC.

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/21/2022 13:30; Judge: DOUGLAS, WESLEY R; Docket Type: HEARING; Location: JUDGE'S CHAMBERS VIA ZO; Defendant Attorney: CHAUNCEY, ANTHONY W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/21/2022 13:30; Judge: DOUGLAS, WESLEY R; Docket Type: HEARING; Location: JUDGE'S CHAMBERS VIA ZO; Defendant Attorney: CHAUNCEY, ANTHONY W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/21/2022 13:30; Judge: DOUGLAS, WESLEY R; Docket Type: HEARING; Location: JUDGE'S CHAMBERS VIA ZO; Defendant Attorney: CHAUNCEY, ANTHONY W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/21/2022 13:30; Judge: DOUGLAS, WESLEY R; Docket Type: HEARING; Location: JUDGE'S CHAMBERS VIA ZO; Defendant Attorney: CHAUNCEY, ANTHONY W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketUpdated Event HEARING on 3/21/2022 0130 PM Judge WESLEY DOUGLAS results CANCELLED on 1/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 3/21/2022 at 0130 PM, JC - Judge WESLEY DOUGLAS presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL -MONSTA CLOTHING COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $1,905.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketPOSSESSION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO MICHELLE CUADRAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO CAROLYN CURTIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO TONY CURTIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO MONSTA CLOTHING COMPANY, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCase 122021CA000291CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/10/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less